NJ SJR22 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AJR173
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR99
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR161
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR99
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR161
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 11th of each year as "Heroes Day."
Title
Designates September 11th of each year as "Heroes Day."
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] |
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (37-0) (Lagana) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR22 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SJR99 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR150 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR161 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
SJR99 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR150 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
AJR161 (Carry Over) 2018-10-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SJR22 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SJR/22_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SJR22 |