NJ SJR18 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR50
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 19 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May of each year as "Skin Cancer Detection and Prevention Month" and first Monday in May as "Melanoma Monday."
Title
Designates May of each year as "Skin Cancer Detection and Prevention Month" and first Monday in May as "Melanoma Monday."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR50 (Carry Over) 2015-11-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
AJR41 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
AJR41 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee