NJ SCR29 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR167
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to enact "Huntington's Disease Parity Act."
Title
Urges President and Congress to enact "Huntington's Disease Parity Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR165 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR165 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Resolution Passed Senate (36-0) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-2) |
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR165 (1R) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR167 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
ACR165 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SCR29 (1R)
ACR165 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SCR29 (1R)