NJ ACR165 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR167
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SCR29 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SCR29 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges President and Congress to enact "Huntington's Disease Parity Act."
Title
Urges President and Congress to enact "Huntington's Disease Parity Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR29 (1R) |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter) |
2018-09-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR29 (Same As) 2019-06-27 - Filed with Secretary of State
SCR167 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SCR167 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee