NJ SCR24 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR131
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR129
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR193
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR129
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR193
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Opposes State Board of Education revised New Jersey Student Learning Standards for Comprehensive Health and Physical Education on sex education adopted on June 3, 2020.
Title
Opposes State Board of Education revised New Jersey Student Learning Standards for Comprehensive Health and Physical Education on sex education adopted on June 3, 2020.
Sponsors
Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] |
Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR24 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SCR129 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
ACR193 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
ACR21 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SCR129 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
ACR193 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
ACR21 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SCR24 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SCR/24_I1.HTM |