NJ ACR21 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future ACR131
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR193
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR129

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Opposes State Board of Education revised New Jersey Student Learning Standards for Comprehensive Health and Physical Education on sex education adopted on June 3, 2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Opposes State Board of Education revised New Jersey Student Learning Standards for Comprehensive Health and Physical Education on sex education adopted on June 3, 2020.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-11AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

ACR21 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
ACR193 (Carry Over) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
SCR129 (Carry Over) 2020-09-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
SCR24 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback