NJ SCR133 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-24 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends State Constitution to permit sports wagering through casinos and current or former horse racetracks on any collegiate athletic competitions.
Title
Amends State Constitution to permit sports wagering through casinos and current or former horse racetracks on any collegiate athletic competitions.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR200 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for ACR200 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (70-4-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for ACR200 (2R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-1) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Public Hearing Held SBA |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR200 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by SCR133 (1R)