NJ ACR200 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by SCR133 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by SCR133 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends State Constitution to permit sports wagering through casinos and current or former horse racetracks on any collegiate athletic competitions.
Title
Amends State Constitution to permit sports wagering through casinos and current or former horse racetracks on any collegiate athletic competitions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by SCR133 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2021-05-06 | Assembly | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Senate |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Concurrent Resolution Placed on Desk in Assembly |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-11-19 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR133 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Filed with Secretary of State