NJ SCR132 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on December 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-12-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment authorizing Legislature by law to allow wagering at Atlantic City casinos and at horse racetracks on sports events.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment authorizing Legislature by law to allow wagering at Atlantic City casinos and at horse racetracks on sports events.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] |
Sen. Raymond Lesniak [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-12-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-14 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Assembly (54-17-4) | |
2010-12-13 | Substituted for ACR167 | |
2010-12-13 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-13 | Passed by the Senate (36-3) | |
2010-12-09 | Public Hearing Held | |
2010-11-22 | Concurrent Resolutions Placed on desk in Assembly | |
2010-11-22 | Constitutional Amendments Placed on Desk in Senate | |
2010-11-22 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-11-22 | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee | |
2010-11-15 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR167 (Same As) 2010-12-13 - Substituted by SCR132
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/SCR132 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/SCR/132_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR132 |