NJ ACR167 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by SCR132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-12-13 - Substituted by SCR132
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposes constitutional amendment authorizing Legislature by law to allow wagering at Atlantic City casinos and at horse racetracks on sports events.
Title
Proposes constitutional amendment authorizing Legislature by law to allow wagering at Atlantic City casinos and at horse racetracks on sports events.
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Rep. Matthew Milam [D] | Rep. Ruben Ramos [D] |
Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-13 | Substituted by SCR132 | |
2010-12-09 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-12-06 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulatory Oversight and Gaming Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR132 (Same As) 2010-12-14 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/ACR167 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/ACR/167_I1.HTM |