NJ S993 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Approved P.L.2016, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-30 - Approved P.L.2016, c.11.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits DHS to request waiver of time limits for certain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients under certain circumstances.*
Title
Permits DHS to request waiver of time limits for certain Supplemental Nutrition Assistance Program recipients under certain circumstances.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 72 N: 3 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2777 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2777 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 10 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2016, c.11. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-3-0) |
2016-05-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-05-09 | Senate | 2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0) |
2016-04-18 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (59-10-6) |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A2777 |
2016-02-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-0) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2777 (Same As) 2016-02-18 - Substituted by S993