NJ S989 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Approved P.L.2021, c.68.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Healthy Terminals Act"; requires certain airport and train station workers to be paid certain wage rates and benefits.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Healthy Terminals Act"; requires certain airport and train station workers to be paid certain wage rates and benefits.*

Sponsors

Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D]Sen. Linda Greenstein [D]Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D]Rep. Annette Quijano [D]
Rep. Daniel Benson [D]Rep. Joseph Egan [D]Rep. Shanique Speight [D]Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D]
Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D]Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D]Sen. Troy Singleton [D]Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D]
Sen. Brian Stack [D]Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D]Sen. Richard Codey [D]Sen. Joseph Lagana [D]
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D]Sen. Vin Gopal [D]Sen. Nellie Pou [D]Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D]
Sen. Joseph Cryan [D]Sen. Paul Sarlo [D]Rep. Jamel Holley [D]Rep. Annette Chaparro [D]
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D]Rep. Britnee Timberlake [D]Rep. Angela Mcknight [D]Rep. Carol Murphy [D]
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D]Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D]Rep. John McKeon [D]Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D]
Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D]Rep. Raj Mukherji [D]Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D]Rep. Thomas Giblin [D]
Rep. Gordon Johnson [D]Rep. Pedro Mejia [D]Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D]Rep. James Kennedy [D]
Rep. John Burzichelli [D]Rep. William Moen [D]Rep. Andrew Zwicker [D]Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D]
Rep. Eliana Marin [D]Rep. Joe Danielsen [D]Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D]Rep. Gary Schaer [D]
Rep. Adam Taliaferro [D]Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D]Rep. Roy Freiman [D]Rep. William Spearman [D]
Rep. Linda Carter [D]Rep. Lisa Swain [D]Rep. Christopher Tully [D]Rep. Mila Jasey [D]
Rep. Joann Downey [D]Rep. Ralph Caputo [D]Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D]Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D]
Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D]Rep. Herbert Conaway [D]Rep. Sterley Stanley [D]

Roll Calls

2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 25 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2487 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 12 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-10 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29AssemblyApproved P.L.2021, c.68.
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (47-25-0)
2021-03-25AssemblySubstituted for A2487 (ACS)
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-03-15AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2021-02-22AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2021-02-19SenatePassed by the Senate (23-12)
2021-02-11SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-08-10SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-08-10SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-30SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2487 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S989 (SCS)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback