NJ S977 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4808

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Approved P.L.2016, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits possession, transport, import, export, processing, sale, or shipment of parts and products of certain animal species threatened with extinction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits possession, transport, import, export, processing, sale, or shipment of parts and products of certain animal species threatened with extinction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Emergency Resolution Vote (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 21 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2447 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 14 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-01AssemblyApproved P.L.2016, c.6.
2016-05-26AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (56-3-3)
2016-05-26AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2016-05-26SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2016-05-09Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (40-0)
2016-05-02SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2016-03-14AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (53-14-8)
2016-03-14AssemblySubstituted for A2447
2016-03-03AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-16AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2016-02-11SenatePassed by the Senate (32-0)
2016-02-04SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-02-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2447 (Same As) 2016-03-14 - Substituted by S977
A4808 (Carry Over) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S3416 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback