NJ S976 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S282

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.62.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

"Revised State Medical Examiner Act"; establishes Office of the Chief State Medical Examiner in DOH.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Revised State Medical Examiner Act"; establishes Office of the Chief State Medical Examiner in DOH.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1709 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.62.
2018-06-25AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0)
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2018-06-07Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (37-0)
2018-05-31SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0)
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted for A1709 (1R)
2018-04-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-03-13SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S282 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1709 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S976 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback