NJ S974 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2824
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State Capitol Joint Management Commission display representation of Alice Paul in State Capitol building.
Title
Requires State Capitol Joint Management Commission display representation of Alice Paul in State Capitol building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
S974 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3884 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
A3884 (Same As) 2020-03-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S974 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/974_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S974 |