NJ S971 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5863

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

"New Jersey Fair Play Act"; allows collegiate student-athletes to earn compensation for use of name, image, or likeness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"New Jersey Fair Play Act"; allows collegiate student-athletes to earn compensation for use of name, image, or likeness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (21-11)
2020-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2106 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A5863 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback