NJ S968 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-11 - Approved P.L.2021, c.82.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public water systems to provide notice of elevated lead levels in drinking water to customers and local officials; requires landlords to notify tenants of elevated lead levels.
Title
Requires public water systems to provide notice of elevated lead levels in drinking water to customers and local officials; requires landlords to notify tenants of elevated lead levels.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Declan O'Scanlon [R] | Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2863 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2863 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-11 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.82. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A2863 (2R) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2863 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by S968 (2R)