NJ S92 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4050

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on August 27 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-11-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes issuance of Protect Pollinators license plates.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes issuance of Protect Pollinators license plates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-22 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-29 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-16AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2020-10-22AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-10-19AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
2020-09-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2020-08-27SenatePassed by the Senate (38-1)
2020-07-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4050 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A4717 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback