NJ S908 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3661

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Vetoed on August 13 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-27 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Clarifies association assessment payment requirements in planned real estate developments.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clarifies association assessment payment requirements in planned real estate developments.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2480 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-27SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-08-27AssemblyEmergency Resolution (37-0) (Singleton)
2020-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2020-08-13AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2020-06-29SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2020-06-25SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-06-18AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-1-1)
2020-06-18AssemblySubstituted for A2480 (1R)
2020-03-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-27SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A2480 (Same As) 2020-06-18 - Substituted by S908 (1R)
S3661 (Carry Over) 2019-08-27 - Received in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback