NJ S875 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3223

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "Sexual Assault Victim's Bill of Rights."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "Sexual Assault Victim's Bill of Rights."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-08SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-02-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3223 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1711 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback