NJ S854 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.197.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.197.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates certain service contracts to perform maintenance, repair, replacement, or service of property used for personal, family, or household purposes.
Title
Regulates certain service contracts to perform maintenance, repair, replacement, or service of property used for personal, family, or household purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1740 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1740 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-24 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.197. |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A1740 (3R) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-06-24 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2013-06-24 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1740 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S854 (2R)