NJ S845 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3486

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health care professional licensing boards to utilize National Practitioner Data Bank.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health care professional licensing boards to utilize National Practitioner Data Bank.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3486 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A4649 (Same As) 2020-09-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback