NJ S830 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3991
Note: Carry Over of previous A5653
Note: Carry Over of previous A5653
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.265.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on November 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.265.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires public water systems to offer drinking water tests to customers in certain circumstances.
Title
Requires public water systems to offer drinking water tests to customers in certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2134 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2134 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-10 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.265. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A2134 (1R) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Tully) |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2020-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3991 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A2134 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S830 (1R)
A5653 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee
A2134 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S830 (1R)
A5653 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee