NJ S824 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2447

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.248.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises certain drunk driving penalties; expands use of ignition interlock devices.**

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises certain drunk driving penalties; expands use of ignition interlock devices.**

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2089 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 5 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 28 N: 5 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.248.
2019-06-20SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-5)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (75-2-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A2089 (ACS)
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Downey)
2019-06-20AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2019-06-20SenatePassed by the Senate (30-5)
2019-06-17SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-09-24SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-09-24SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2447 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2089 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S824 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback