NJ S82 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Approved P.L.2010, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-05 - Approved P.L.2010, c.9.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Modifies development application process under the "Municipal Land Use Law."
Title
Modifies development application process under the "Municipal Land Use Law."
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chiusano [R] | Rep. Alex DeCroce [R] | Rep. Gerald Green [D] | Rep. Alison McHose [R] |
Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Sen. Ronald Rice [D] | Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Rep. Charlotte Vandervalk [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 18 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-05 | Approved P.L.2010, c.9. | |
2010-03-15 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-14-11) | |
2010-03-15 | Substituted for A437 (1R) | |
2010-03-11 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Passed by the Senate (26-8) | |
2010-02-04 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A437 (Same As) 2010-03-15 - Substituted by S82