NJ S792 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3230
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Approved P.L.2017, c.45.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permits newly created regional school districts or enlarging regional school districts to determine apportionment methodology for their boards of education on basis other than population.
Title
Permits newly created regional school districts or enlarging regional school districts to determine apportionment methodology for their boards of education on basis other than population.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1271 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.45. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0) |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A1271 |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-03-14 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3230 (Carry Over) 2015-12-14 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A1271 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S792
A1271 (Same As) 2017-03-16 - Substituted by S792