NJ S787 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3920
Note: Carry Over of previous A5698
Note: Carry Over of previous A5698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-11 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental transportation aid to certain districts participating in interdistrict public school choice program.
Title
Provides supplemental transportation aid to certain districts participating in interdistrict public school choice program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2024-01-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3920 (Carry Over) 2023-06-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5698 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1426 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A5698 (Carry Over) 2023-11-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1426 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee