NJ S758 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S4245
Note: Carry Over of previous A5746
Note: Carry Over of previous A5746
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.140.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Reopens Workers Compensation Judges Part of PERS and requires Workers' Compensation Judges to be enrolled in PERS.
Title
Reopens Workers Compensation Judges Part of PERS and requires Workers' Compensation Judges to be enrolled in PERS.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Nicholas Scutari [D] | Rep. Sean Kean [R] | Sen. Jon Bramnick [R] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1032 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1032 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.140. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-3) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (56-19-0) |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A1032 (3R) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (29-5) |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4245 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A1032 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S758 (3R)
A5746 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A1032 (Same As) 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S758 (3R)
A5746 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee