NJ S748 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2464
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Transferred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-12-05 - Transferred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds one dental assistant to NJ State Board of Dentistry.
Title
Adds one dental assistant to NJ State Board of Dentistry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-9) |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2464 (Carry Over) 2016-07-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A5230 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
A5230 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/S748 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/S1000/748_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S748 |