NJ S739 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A935
Note: Carry Over of previous S834
Note: Carry Over of previous A1169
Note: Carry Over of previous S834
Note: Carry Over of previous A1169
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-31 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-10-31 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides gross income tax credit to certain taxpayers who pay for certain in-home services through health care service firm.
Title
Provides gross income tax credit to certain taxpayers who pay for certain in-home services through health care service firm.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-10-31 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-10-31 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S739 (Carry Over) 2022-10-31 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S834 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1169 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S834 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1169 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee