NJ A1169 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A524
Note: Carry Foward to future S739
Note: Carry Over of previous A5637
Note: Carry Over of previous S4000
Note: Carry Foward to future S739
Note: Carry Over of previous A5637
Note: Carry Over of previous S4000
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides gross income tax credit to certain taxpayers who pay for certain in-home services through health care service firm.
Title
Provides gross income tax credit to certain taxpayers who pay for certain in-home services through health care service firm.
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-02 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-02 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1169 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1169 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5637 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S834 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4000 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A1169 (Carry Over) 2021-06-02 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A5637 (Carry Over) 2019-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S834 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4000 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee