NJ S736 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.85.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Approved P.L.2015, c.85.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes crimes of dog fighting and leader of a dog fighting network, and updates crime of animal fighting; amends RICO concerning dog fighting.*
Title
Establishes crimes of dog fighting and leader of a dog fighting network, and updates crime of animal fighting; amends RICO concerning dog fighting.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3037 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3037 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3037 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.85. |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3037 (ACS/1R) |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3596 (Same As) 2014-12-11 - Combined with A3037/2547/2422 (ACS)