NJ S724 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A345
Note: Carry Foward to future S1785
Note: Carry Over of previous S78
Note: Carry Over of previous A1382
Note: Carry Foward to future S1785
Note: Carry Over of previous S78
Note: Carry Over of previous A1382
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes municipality to deliver property tax bills, construction permits, and receipts for payment via e-mail.
Title
Authorizes municipality to deliver property tax bills, construction permits, and receipts for payment via e-mail.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S724 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S724 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S78 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3481 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1382 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S724 (Carry Over) 2021-02-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S78 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3481 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1382 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S724 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/724_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S724 |