NJ S721 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S2874

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizes use of certain electric school buses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizes use of certain electric school buses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-02-01SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-01-22SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2874 (Carry Over) 2017-06-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A1751 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback