NJ S705 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3068

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.60.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Transgender Equality Task Force.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Transgender Equality Task Force.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1727 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 6 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-03AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.60.
2018-05-24AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (65-6-0)
2018-05-24AssemblySubstituted for A1727
2018-03-12AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2018-02-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3068 (Carry Over) 2017-03-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1727 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S705

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback