NJ S700 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1459
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.383.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.383.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Higher Education Citizenship Equality Act;" defines domicile for dependent students for purpose of eligibility for State student grants and scholarships, and resident tuition rate.*
Title
"Higher Education Citizenship Equality Act;" defines domicile for dependent students for purpose of eligibility for State student grants and scholarships, and resident tuition rate.*
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 36 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3836 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3836 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Higher Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.383. |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-1) |
2019-12-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-2-5) |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Substituted for A3836 (1R) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1459 (Carry Over) 2017-05-18 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3836 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S700 (3R)
A3836 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S700 (3R)