NJ S699 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4144

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 30 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires training for DOE arbitrators to include issues related to cultural diversity and bias.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires training for DOE arbitrators to include issues related to cultural diversity and bias.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-07-30AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
2020-07-30SenatePassed by the Senate (39-1)
2020-06-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4144 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5245 (Same As) 2021-01-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback