NJ S699 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1458
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Approved P.L.2018, c.12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-09 - Approved P.L.2018, c.12.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for State student financial aid programs.
Title
Allows certain students including undocumented immigrants who meet certain criteria to qualify for State student financial aid programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3467 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Table Motion (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 24 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-09 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.12. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (49-24-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Table (Greenwald) (49-24-0) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Motion To Aa (Bramnick) |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Substituted for A3467 (1R) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (27-10) |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1458 (Carry Over) 2016-02-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3467 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S699 (1R)
A3467 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S699 (1R)