NJ S698 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4037

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-3)
Status: Passed on October 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-10-08 - Approved P.L.2020, c.102.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Allows public office holder or candidate to use political contributions to pay for child care expenses related to office or campaign activities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows public office holder or candidate to use political contributions to pay for child care expenses related to office or campaign activities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2060 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 5 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-08AssemblyApproved P.L.2020, c.102.
2020-08-27AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (66-5-4)
2020-08-27AssemblySubstituted for A2060
2020-08-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

S4037 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2060 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S698

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback