NJ S692 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S504
Note: Carryover of previous S504

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits the DOE from regulating maximum salary amount school district may pay its superintendent of schools and codifies standards for contract review.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits the DOE from regulating maximum salary amount school district may pay its superintendent of schools and codifies standards for contract review.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-20AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)
2019-06-10AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
2018-02-26SenatePassed by the Senate (24-15)
2018-02-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-25SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-01-25SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S504 (Carry Over) 2017-02-06 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S504 (Carry Over) 2014-01-30 - Combined with S846 (SCS)
A3775 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Sumter)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback