NJ S612 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on December 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-12-03 - Approved P.L.2012, c.71.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for licensure of elevator, escalator, and moving walkway mechanics by State board.
Title
Provides for licensure of elevator, escalator, and moving walkway mechanics by State board.
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Sweeney [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] | Sen. John Burzichelli [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] |
Rep. Thomas Giblin [D] | Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1519 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A1519 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-12-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, c.71. |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-11) |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-28-0) |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Substituted for A1519 (ACS/1R) |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
2012-06-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-16) |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (31-0) (Weinberg) |
2012-06-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1519 (Same As) 2012-10-18 - Substituted by S612 (2R)