NJ S604 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3468
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.100.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that electric power supplier license issued by BPU may be renewed without expiring if certain conditions are met.
Title
Provides that electric power supplier license issued by BPU may be renewed without expiring if certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4010 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-17 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.100. |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4010 (1R) |
2019-02-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2018-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3468 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4010 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S604 (1R)
A4010 (Same As) 2019-02-25 - Substituted by S604 (1R)