NJ S596 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-1-1)
Status: Passed on July 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-03 - Approved P.L.2017, c.93.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes compensation program for law enforcement officers and certain other employees injured while performing official duties.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes compensation program for law enforcement officers and certain other employees injured while performing official duties.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3422 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 4 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-03 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-03SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.93.
2017-06-22SenatePassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2017-06-22SenateReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2017-06-19AssemblyPassed by the Senate (38-0)
2017-05-25Assembly2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (38-0)
2017-05-01AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2017-03-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0)
2017-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (62-4-2)
2017-02-15AssemblySubstituted for A3422 (2R)
2017-01-30AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-11-14AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2016-11-14SenatePassed by the Senate (32-0)
2016-09-26SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-03-07SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2016-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-12SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee

Same As/Similar To

S491 (Carry Over) 2016-01-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A2347 (Same As) 2016-02-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A3422 (Same As) 2017-02-15 - Substituted by S596 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback