NJ S562 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on January 9 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-09 - Approved P.L.2014, c.88.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requires health insurance carriers to encrypt certain information.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires health insurance carriers to encrypt certain information.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3322 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3322 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-10-23 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-01-09AssemblyApproved P.L.2014, c.88.
2014-11-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
2014-11-13AssemblySubstituted for A3322
2014-10-23AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-05-08AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2014-03-27SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2014-03-17SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2014-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3322 (Same As) 2014-11-13 - Substituted by S562 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback