NJ S555 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S881
Note: Carry Over of previous A3369
Note: Carry Over of previous A3369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides gross income tax deduction for certain donated vehicles.
Title
Provides gross income tax deduction for certain donated vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S881 (Carry Over) 2022-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3369 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2733 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3369 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2733 (Same As) 2024-02-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S555 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/555_I1.HTM |