NJ S523 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A470
Note: Carry Over of previous S3821
Note: Carry Over of previous A5406
Note: Carry Over of previous S3821
Note: Carry Over of previous A5406
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.332.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Enters New Jersey into Interstate Medical Licensure Compact.
Title
Enters New Jersey into Interstate Medical Licensure Compact.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Joseph Cryan [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] |
Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1112 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1112 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-14 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.332. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted for A1112 |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2021-01-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S523 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Approved P.L.2021, c.332.
S3821 (Carry Over) 2019-05-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1112 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S523
A5406 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3821 (Carry Over) 2019-05-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1112 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S523
A5406 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee