NJ S516 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S218
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 22 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-09-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases criminal penalties if leaving loaded firearm within easy access of minor results in injury or death.
Title
Increases criminal penalties if leaving loaded firearm within easy access of minor results in injury or death.
Sponsors
Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Donald Norcross [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-09-18 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-09-22 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-09-22 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (31-6) |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S516 (Carry Over) 2014-09-22 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1230 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1230 (Same As) 2014-01-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2014/S516 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2014/S1000/516_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S516 |