NJ S515 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2600
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.98.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.98.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts sales of certain materials used in industrial sand casting processes from sales and use tax.
Title
Exempts sales of certain materials used in industrial sand casting processes from sales and use tax.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] |
Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4060 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-04 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.98. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-1) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A4060 |
2019-01-28 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-06 | Assembly | Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to enact |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reviewed by the Sales Tax Review Commission Recommend to enact |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2600 (Carry Over) 2016-09-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A4060 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S515
A4060 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S515