NJ S478 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S283
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-2)
Status: Passed on July 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-03 - Approved P.L.2018, c.58.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
"Babs Siperstein Law"; revises procedure for issuance of amended birth certificate for person who has undergone change in gender.**
Title
"Babs Siperstein Law"; revises procedure for issuance of amended birth certificate for person who has undergone change in gender.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1718 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1718 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 11 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 30 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-03 | Senate | Approved P.L.2018, c.58. |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (30-2) |
2018-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (57-11-3) |
2018-05-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A1718 (2R) |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-12 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-03-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (30-7) |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S283 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1718 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S478 (2R)
A1718 (Same As) 2018-05-24 - Substituted by S478 (2R)