NJ S477 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S280
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-4)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved P.L.2019, c.120.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends statute of limitations in civil actions for sexual abuse claims; expands categories of potential defendants in civil actions; creates two-year window for parties to bring previously time-barred actions based on sexual abuse.*
Title
Extends statute of limitations in civil actions for sexual abuse claims; expands categories of potential defendants in civil actions; creates two-year window for parties to bring previously time-barred actions based on sexual abuse.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3648 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.120. |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-5) |
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A3648 (ACS) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-1) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S280 (Carry Over) 2016-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3648 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S477 (SCS)
A3648 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S477 (SCS)